Docket for 16-1354
|
Mar 23 2017 | Application (16A928) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 4, 2017 to May 4, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | | Mar 29 2017 | Application (16A928) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until May 4, 2017. | | | May 04 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 8, 2017) | | | May 22 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 10, 2017. | | | Aug 02 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. | | |
|