Docket for 16-1278
|
Apr 21 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 25, 2017) | | | May 04 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 26, 2017. | | | Jun 26 2017 | Brief of respondent Muskingum Watershed Conservancy District in opposition filed. | | | Jul 12 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|