Docket for 16-1221
|
Apr 10 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 12, 2017) | | | Apr 18 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 16, 2017. | | | Apr 27 2017 | Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner. | | | May 01 2017 | Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or neither party, received from counsel for respondents. | | | May 12 2017 | Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. | | | May 12 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. | | | May 12 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Manufacturers filed. | | | May 12 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of The Grocery Manufacturers Association filed. | | | Jun 16 2017 | Brief of respondents Robert Briseno, et al. in opposition filed. | | | Jul 05 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017. | | | Jul 05 2017 | Reply of petitioner Conagra Brands, Inc. filed. (Distributed) | | | Jul 11 2017 | Supplemental brief of respondents Robert Briseno, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | | Jul 13 2017 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Conagra Brands, Inc. filed. (Distributed) | | | Aug 18 2017 | Second supplemental brief of respondents Robert Briseno, et al. filed. (Distributed) | | | Aug 18 2017 | Second supplemental brief of petitioner Conagra Brands, Inc. filed. (Distributed) | | | Sep 21 2017 | Rescheduled. | | | Oct 02 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017. | | | Oct 10 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|