Docket for 16-1153
|
Mar 20 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 24, 2017) | | | Mar 24 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent Charles J. McKee, County Counsel of Monterey County, California to respond filed. | | | Mar 28 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent Alison A. Barratt-Greene, County of Nevada County, California to respond filed. | | | Apr 11 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent Christopher A. Callihan, City of Attorney for the City of Salinas, California, in his official capacity to respond filed. | | | Apr 14 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 24, 2017. | | | Apr 20 2017 | Brief amici curiae of National Association of Evangelicals, Christian Legal Society, et al. filed. VIDED | | | May 24 2017 | Brief of respondents State Respondents in opposition filed. VIDED. | | | Jun 01 2017 | Reply of petitioners Livingwell Medical Clinic, Inc., et al. filed. | | | Jun 06 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017. | | | Jun 19 2017 | Record Requested. | | | Jun 19 2017 | Record received from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit. The record is electronic and available on PACER. | | | Jun 21 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017. | | | Sep 21 2017 | Rescheduled. | | | Oct 02 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017. | | | Oct 10 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017. | | | Oct 23 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017. | | | Oct 30 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2017. | | | Nov 02 2017 | Letter of November 2, 2017, from counsel for respondents received. VIDED (Distributed) | | | Nov 06 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2017. | | | Jun 27 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018. | | | Jun 28 2018 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of National Institute of Family and Life Advocates v. Becerra, 585 U. S. ____ (2018). | | | Jul 30 2018 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. | | |
|