Docket for 16-1144
|
Mar 21 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 21, 2017) | | | Apr 12 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 22, 2017. | | | Apr 21 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of The American College of Tax Counsel filed. | | | Apr 21 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Cause of Action Institute, at el. filed. | | | May 22 2017 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | | May 25 2017 | Letter of May 25, 2017, with supplemental authority from the Acting Solicitor General received. | | | Jun 05 2017 | Reply of petitioner Carl J. Marinello, II filed. | | | Jun 06 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017. | | | Jun 26 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 26, 2017. | | | Jun 27 2017 | Petition GRANTED. | | | Aug 03 2017 | The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 1, 2017. | | | Aug 03 2017 | The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 23, 2017. | | | Aug 23 2017 | Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Carl J. Marinello, II. | | | Sep 01 2017 | Brief of petitioner Carl J. Marinello, II filed. | | | Sep 08 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of American College of Tax Counsel filed. | | | Sep 08 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of New York Council of Defense Lawyers filed. | | | Sep 08 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Cause of Action Institute and National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. | | | Sep 08 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed. | | | Sep 25 2017 | Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED. | | | Oct 06 2017 | SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, December 5, 2017 | | | Oct 18 2017 | Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit. | | | Oct 19 2017 | Record received from the U.S.C.A. is electronic. | | | Oct 20 2017 | CIRCULATED | | | Oct 23 2017 | Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed) | | | Nov 15 2017 | This case is removed from the oral argument calendar for Tuesday, December 5, 2017, and has been SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, December 6, 2017. | | | Nov 22 2017 | Reply of petitioner Carl J. Marinello, II filed. (Distributed) | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | Dec 06 2017 | Argued. For petitioner: Matthew S. Hellman, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Robert A. Parker, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. | | | Mar 21 2018 | Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Breyer, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, Ginsburg, Sotomayor, Kagan, and Gorsuch, JJ., joined. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Alito, J., joined. | | | Apr 23 2018 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. | | |
|