Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-111
RSS Feed Print
No. 16-111
Title:Masterpiece Cakeshop, Ltd., et al., Petitioners
v.
Colorado Civil Rights Commission, et al.
Docketed:July 25, 2016
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Colorado
   Case Numbers:(2015COA115)
   Decision Date:August 13, 2015
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:April 25, 2016
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 22 2016Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 24, 2016)
Aug 04 2016Waiver of right of respondents Colorado Civil Rights Commission, et al. to respond filed.
Aug 11 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 23, 2016, for all respondents.
Aug 22 2016Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Foundation For Moral Law.
Aug 23 2016Waiver of right of respondents Charlie Craig and David Mullins to respond filed.
Aug 24 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016.
Aug 31 2016Response Requested. (Due September 30, 2016)
Sep 15 2016Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 29, 2016, for all respondents.
Nov 28 2016Brief of respondents Charlie Craig and David Mullins in opposition filed.
Nov 29 2016Brief of respondent Colorado Civil Rights Commission in opposition filed.
Dec 12 2016Reply of petitioners Masterpiece Cakeshop, Ltd., et al. filed.
Dec 14 2016DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Jan 03 2017Rescheduled.
Jan 09 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017.
Jan 10 2017Record Requested.
Jan 30 2017Record received from the Supreme Court of Colorado (1 box).
Feb 01 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017.
Feb 15 2017Rescheduled.
Feb 21 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2017.
Feb 27 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2017.
Mar 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 17, 2017.
Mar 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 24, 2017.
Mar 27 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 31, 2017.
Apr 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017.
Apr 17 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017.
Apr 24 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 28, 2017.
May 08 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017.
May 12 2017Letter of May 12, 2017, from counsel for petitioner received. (Distributed)
May 15 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 18, 2017.
May 22 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 25, 2017.
May 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 1, 2017.
Jun 05 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 8, 2017.
Jun 12 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 15, 2017.
Jun 19 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.
Jun 26 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Foundation For Moral Law GRANTED.
Jun 26 2017Petition GRANTED.
Jul 12 2017The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 31, 2017.
Jul 12 2017The time to file respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including October 23, 2017.
Jul 20 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party, or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioners.
Jul 26 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondent Colorado Civil Rights Commission.
Aug 30 2017Brief amici curiae of Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, et al. filed.
Aug 31 2017Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Aug 31 2017Brief of petitioners Masterpiece Cakeshop, Ltd., et al. filed.
Aug 31 2017Brief amici curiae of Indiana Family Institute, Inc., et al. filed.
Sep 01 2017Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Sep 06 2017Brief amici curiae of Rev. Patrick Mahoney, et al. filed.
Sep 06 2017Brief amicus curiae of Thomas More Society filed.
Sep 06 2017Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Sep 06 2017Brief amici curiae of Ryan T. Anderson, Ph.D., et al. filed.
Sep 06 2017Brief amicus curiae of Independence Law Center filed.
Sep 06 2017Brief amici curiae of North Carolina Values Coalition and the Family Research Council filed.
Sep 06 2017Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Sep 06 2017Brief amici curiae of Law and Economics Scholars filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Counsel filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of National Black Religious Broadcasters, et al. filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of William Jack and The National Center for Law and Policy filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Mark Regnerus, et al. filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Becket Fund for Religious Liberty filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Cake Artists in support of neither party filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Agudath Israel of America filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of 33 Family Policy Organizations filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of International Christian Photographers and Center for Arizona Policy filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence and National Organization for Marriage filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of 34 Legal Scholars filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Sherif Girgis filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Public Advocate of the United States, et al. filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Christian Business Owners Supporting Religious Freedom filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Richard Lawrence filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Council for Christian Colleges and Universities (CCCU), et al. filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of United States Senators and Representatives filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of American College of Pediatricians, et al. filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, et al. filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of C 12 Group, et al. filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice in support of neither party filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Aaron and Melissa Klein filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Jewish Commission on Law and Public Affairs ("COLPA") filed on behalf of Orthodox Jewish Organizations filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society, et al. filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Legal Scholar Adam J. MacLeod filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Professors Christopher R. Green and David R. Upham filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Freedom X and Rabbi Dovid Bressman filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of 479 Creative Professionals filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Restoring Religious Freedom Project filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of First Amendment Lawyers Association filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of States of Texas, et al. filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of CatholicVote.org filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Concerned Women for America filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amici curiae of National Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of David Boyle in support of neither party filed.
Sep 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Christian Law Association filed.
Sep 08 2017Brief amici curiae of Utah Republican State Senators filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jeremy David Tedesco
    Counsel of Record
15100 N. 90th Street
Scottsdale, AZ 85260

jtedesco@ADFlegal.org
(480)-444-0020
Party name: Masterpiece Cakeshop, Ltd., et al.
Kristen Kellie Waggoner
    Counsel of Record
15100 N. 90th St.
Scottsdale, AZ 85260

480-444-0020
Party name: Masterpiece Cakeshop, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Ria Tabacco Mar
    Counsel of Record
ACLU
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004-2400

rmar@aclu.org
212-549-2627
Party name: Charlie Craig and David Mullins
Frederick R. Yarger
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Colorado Judicial Center
1300 Broadway, 10th Floor
Denver, CO 80203

fred.yarger@coag.gov
(720) 508-6168
Party name: Colorado Civil Rights Commission
Leslie Cooper125 Broad Street
18th floor
New York, NY 10004

lcooper@aclu.org
212 549 2500
Party name: Charlie Craig and David Mullins
Other
Richard C. Baker
    Counsel of Record
Mauck & Baker, LLC
1 N. LaSalle St., Suite 600
Chicago, IL 60602

rbaker@mauckbaker.com
(312)-853-8708
Party name: C 12 Group, et al.
William J. Becker Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Freedom X
11500 Olympic Blvd., Suite 400
Los Angeles, CA 90064

bill@freedomxlaw.com
310-636-1018
Party name: Freedom X and Rabbi Dovid Bressman
James Bopp Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Bopp Law Firm, PC
The National Building
1 South Sixth Street
Terre Haute, IN 47807

jboppjr@aol.com
812-232-2434
Party name: Indiana Family Institute, Inc., et al.
David Christopher Boyle
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 15143
Long Beach, CA 90815

dbo@boyleslaw.org
(734)-904-6132
Party name: David Boyle
Thomas Brejcha Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Thomas More Society
19 South LaSalle Street, Suite 603
Chicago, IL 60603

tbrejcha@thomasmoresociety.org
(312) 782-1680
Party name: Thomas More Society
Roger G. Brooks
    Counsel of Record
3804 W. Cornwallis Rd.
Durham, NC 27705

brooks3804@gmail.com
919-402-1758
Party name: American College of Pediatricians, et al.
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
9339 Cherry Valley Ave. SE, Suite 78
Caledonia, MI 49316

jbursch@burschlaw.com
616-450-4235
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al.
Frederick W. Claybrook
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
1001 Pa. Ave., N.W., 8th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3883
Party name: National Legal Foundation, et al.
Robert Lawrence Corn-Revere
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
1919 Pennsylvania Ave., NW,
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

bobcornrevere@dwt.com
202-973-4200
Party name: First Amendment Lawyers Association
Deborah Dewart
    Counsel of Record
620 E. Sabiston Drive
Swansboro, NC 28584-9674

debcpalaw@earthlink.net
(910)-326-4554
Party name: North Carolina Values Coalition and the Family Research Council
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
909-493-5706
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence and National Organization for Marriage
John Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law, One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
334-262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Michael K. Erickson
    Counsel of Record
Ray Quinney & Nebeker, P.C.
36 S. State Street, Suite 1400
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

merickson@rqn.com
801-323-3351
Party name: Utah Republican State Senators
Steven Werner Fitschen
    Counsel of Record
National Legal Foundation
2224 Virginia Beach Blvd.
Suite 204
Virginia Beach, VA 23454

nlf@nlf.net
(757)-463-6133
Party name: Concerned Women for America
Michael Lee Francisco
    Counsel of Record
MRD Law
620 N. Tejon Street, Suite 101
Colorado Springs, CO 80903

michael.francisco@mrd.law
303-325-7843
Party name: William Jack and The National Center for Law and Policy
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
David Austin French
    Counsel of Record
National Review Institute
215 Lexington Ave., 11th Fl.
New York, NY 10016

dfrench@nationalreview.com
931-446-7572
Party name: 33 Family Policy Organizations
Scott William Gaylord
    Counsel of Record
Elon University School of Law
201 North Greene Street
Greensboro, NC 27401

sgaylord@elon.edu
336-279-9331
Party name: CatholicVote.org
Robert P. George
    Counsel of Record
Robinson & McElwee, PLLC
700 Virginia Street East, Suite 400
Charleston, WV 25301

rpg@ramlaw.com
304-344-5800
Party name: Sherif Girgis
David C. Gibbs Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Gibbs & Associates Law Firm
5412 Courseview Drive, Suite 122
Mason, OH 45040

dgibbsjr@gibbs-lawfirm.com
(513) 234-5545
Party name: Christian Law Association
Scott A Keller
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

skeller@yettercoleman.com
512-936-1700
Party name: States of Texas, et al.
Nathan W. Kellum
    Counsel of Record
Center for Religious Expression
699 Oakleaf Office Lane, Suite 107
Memphis, TN 38117

nkellum@crelaw.org
(901) 684-5485
Party name: 479 Creative Professionals
David R. Langdon
    Counsel of Record
Langdon Law, LLC
8913 Cincinnati-Dayton Road
West Chester, OH 45069

dlangdon@langdonlaw.com
513.577.7380
Party name: 34 Legal Scholars
Stuart J. Lark
    Counsel of Record
Sherman & Howard LLC
90 South Cascade Avenue
Suite 1500
Colorado Springs, CO 80903

slark@shermanhoward.com
(719) 448-4036
Party name: Billy Graham Evangelistic Association, et al.
Richard Alfred Lawrence
    Counsel of Record
608 S. Hull Street
Montgomery, AL 36104

richard@rlawrencelaw.com
334-263-2000
Party name: Richard Lawrence
Douglas Laycock
    Counsel of Record
University of Virginia School of Law
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

dlaycock@virginia.edu
(434) 243-8546
Party name: Christian Legal Society, et al.
Nathan Lewin
    Counsel of Record
Lewin & Lewin, LLP
888 17th St. NW, 4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

nat@lewinlewin.com
202-828-1000
Party name: National Jewish Commission on Law and Public Affairs ("COLPA") filed on behalf of Orthodox Jewish Organizations
Charles S. LiMandri
    Counsel of Record
Freedom of Conscience Defense Fund
P.O. Box 9520
Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067

cslimandri@limandri.com
(858) 759-9948
Party name: Ryan T. Anderson, Ph.D., et al.
Robert James McNamara
    Counsel of Record
901 N Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

rmcnamara@ij.org
(703)-682-9320
Party name: Institute for Justice
Erin Elizabeth Mersino
    Counsel of Record
Great Lakes Justice Center
5600 W. Mount Hope Hwy.
Lansing, MI 48917

contact@greatlakesjc.org
517-322-3207
Party name: Christian Business Owners Supporting Religious Freedom
Thomas Patrick Monaghan
    Counsel of Record
Free Speech Advocates
6375 New Hope Road
New Hope, KY 40052

monaghanoffice@earthlink.net
502 549 5454
Party name: Rev. Patrick Mahoney, et al.
Michael J. Norton
    Counsel of Record
Thomas N. Scheffel & Associates, P.C.
3801 E. Florida Ave., Suite 600
Denver, CO 80210

nmorton@tnslaw.com
303-759-5937
Party name: International Christian Photographers and Center for Arizona Policy
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

wjo@mindspring.com
703-356-5070
Party name: Public Advocate of the United States, et al.
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP
1170 Peachtree Street NE
Suite 2200
Atlanta, GA 30309

jjp@sbllaw.net
(678)-347-2208
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al.
Eric Christopher Rassbach
    Counsel of Record
1200 New Hampshire Avenue, NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20036

erassbach@becketlaw.org
(202)-955-0095
Party name: Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Gene C. Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr Duncan LLP
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-duncan.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Council for Christian Colleges and Universities (CCCU), et al.
David I. Schoen
    Counsel of Record
2800 Zelda Road
Suite 100-6
Montgomery, AL 36106

dschoen593@aol.com
(334)-395-6611
Party name: Restoring Religious Freedom Project
Kelly J. Shackelford
    Counsel of Record
First Liberty Institute, 2001 W Piano Pkwy
Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075

kshackelford@firstliberty.org
972-941-4444
Party name: Aaron and Melissa Klein
David Allen Shaneyfelt
    Counsel of Record
The Alvearez Firm
24005 Ventura Blvd.
Calabasas,, CA 91302

dshaneyfelt@alvarezfirm.com
(818) 224-7077
Party name: Law and Economics Scholars
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

(202)-842-0200
Party name: Cato Institute, et al.
Mathew D. Staver
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Counsel, PO Box 540774
Second Floor
Orlando, FL 32854

(407)-875-1776
Party name: Liberty Counsel
David H. Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dthompson@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: National Black Religious Broadcasters , et al.
Edward Howard Trent
    Counsel of Record
550 Main Avenue, Suite 900
P.O. Box 2231
Knoxville, TN 37922

etrent@wimberlylawson.com
(865)-546-1000
Party name: Mark Regnerus, et al.
Robert H. Tyler
    Counsel of Record
24910 Las Brisas Road
Suite 109
Murrieta, CA 92562

rtyler@tylerbursch.com
(951)-304-7583
Party name: Legal Scholar Adam J. MacLeod
David R. Upham
    Counsel of Record
University of Dallas, 1845 East Northgate Drive
Irving, TX 75062-4736

davidrupham@yahoo.com
(972) 721-5186
Party name: Professors Christopher R. Green and David R. Upham
Randall L. Wenger
    Counsel of Record
23 N. Front Street, First Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17101

rlwenger@indlawcenter.org
717-657-4990
Party name: Independence Law Center
Jonathan Radford Whitehead
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jonathan R. Whitehead, LLC
229 SE Douglas St., Ste 210
Lee's Summit, MO 64063

jon@whiteheadlawllc.com
816.398.8305
Party name: United States Senators and Representatives
Michael K. Whitehead
    Counsel of Record
Whitehead Law Firm, LLC
1100 Main Street, Suite 2600
Kansas City, MO 64105

mike@thewhiteheadfirm.com
816-398-8967
Party name: Ethics & Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, et al.
Evan Andrew Young
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
98 San Jacinto Boulevard
Suite 1500
Austin, TX 78701-4078

evan.young@bakerbotts.com
(512)-322-2500
Party name: Cake Artists
Jeffrey Ira Zuckerman
    Counsel of Record
The Zuckerman Law Group LLP
1629 K Street, N.W., Suite 300
Washington, DC 20006

jzuckerman@zucklawgroup.com
202-349-3962
Party name: Agudath Israel of America
John A. EidsmoeFoundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
(334) 262-1245
Party name: Foundation For Moral Law

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543