Docket for 16-1098
|
Mar 10 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 10, 2017) | | | Mar 29 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 10, 2017, for all respondents. | | | Apr 04 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent University of North Texas to respond filed. | | | May 04 2017 | Brief of respondent Texas Guaranteed Student Loan Corporation in opposition filed. | | | May 11 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 23, 2017. | | | May 11 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. to respond filed. | | | Jun 06 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017. | | | Jun 12 2017 | Response Requested. (Due July 12, 2017) | | | Jun 30 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 11, 2017, for all respondents. | | | Aug 11 2017 | Brief of respondents JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al. in opposition filed. | | | Aug 30 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|