Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-969
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-969
Title:Freedom Watch, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Google Inc., et al.
Docketed:January 15, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-7030)
   Decision Date:May 27, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:August 5, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 02 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 16, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jan 19 2021Waiver of right of respondent Twitter, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 19 2021Waiver of right of respondent Apple Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 19 2021Waiver of right of respondent Facebook, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 19 2021Waiver of right of respondent Google LLC (formerly Google Inc.) to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 03 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/19/2021.
Feb 19 2021Rescheduled.
Feb 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/26/2021.
Feb 25 2021Rescheduled.
Mar 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/5/2021.
Mar 04 2021Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Larry Elliot Klayman
    Counsel of Record
Klayman Law Group, P.A.
2020 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.,
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

leklayman@gmail.com
3105950800
Party name: Freedom Watch, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Kenneth Winn Allen
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis, LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

winn.allen@kirkland.com
202-389-5078
Party name: Facebook, Inc.
Ian Heath Gershengorn
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IGershengorn@jenner.com
202-639-6869
Party name: Apple Inc.
Jonathan M. Jacobson
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
1301 Avenue of the Americas, 40th Floor
New York, NY 10019

jjacobson@wsgr.com
212-497-7758
Party name: Twitter, Inc.
John E. SchmidtleinWilliam & Connolly, LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

jschmidtlein@wc.com
(202) 434-5901
Party name: Google LLC (formerly Google Inc.)

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543