Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 20-7113
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 20-7113
Title:Troy X. Kelley, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 11, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-30153)
   Decision Date:July 29, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:September 4, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 08 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 15, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service
Feb 23 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 25 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/19/2021.
Mar 22 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Angelo J Calfo
    Counsel of Record
Calfo Eakes LLP
1301 Second Ave Ste 2800
SEATTLE, WA 98101

angeloc@calfoeakes.com
206-407-2210
Party name: Troy X. Kelley
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543