Sep 17 2019 | Application (19A321) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 6, 2019 to November 21, 2019, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
| Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service |
Sep 25 2019 | Application (19A321) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until November 21, 2019. |
| |
Nov 19 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 23, 2019) |
| PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Nov 26 2019 | Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Miladis Salgado. |
| Blanket Consent |
Dec 05 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed. |
| Main Document |
Dec 17 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of Law and Economics Scholars filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Dec 17 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of Practicing Attorneys filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Dec 18 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/10/2020. |
| |
Dec 20 2019 | Response Requested. (Due January 21, 2020) |
| |
Dec 23 2019 | Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Jan 14 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 21, 2020 to February 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jan 15 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 20, 2020. |
| |
Feb 18 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 20, 2020 to February 28, 2020, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Feb 19 2020 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 28, 2020. |
| |
Feb 28 2020 | Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Mar 16 2020 | Reply of petitioner Miladis Salgado filed. (Distributed) |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Mar 18 2020 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/3/2020. |
| |
Apr 06 2020 | Petition DENIED. |
| |