Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-956
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-956
Title:Google LLC, Petitioner
v.
Oracle America, Inc.
Docketed:January 25, 2019
Linked with 18A417
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-1118, 2017-1202)
   Decision Date:March 27, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:August 28, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 19 2018Application (18A417) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 26, 2018 to January 25, 2019, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 23 2018Application (18A417) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 25, 2019.
Jan 24 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 25, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 25, 2019 to March 27, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 27, 2019.
Feb 15 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Google LLC.
Blanket Consent
Feb 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of Developers Alliance filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 22 2019Brief amici curiae of Eight Intellectual Property Scholars filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Amicus brief of Computer & Communications Industry Association not accepted for filing. (February 25, 2019) (Corrected electronic filing submitted)
Feb 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Microsoft Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Brief amici curiae of R Street Institute and Public Knowledge filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Professors Peter S. Menell and David Nimmer filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Sixty Five Intellectual Property Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Feb 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Computer & Communications Industry Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by 78 Computer Scientists.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Antitrust Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Engine Advocacy filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Python Software Foundation and Tidelift filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Software Innovators, Startups, and Investors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2019Brief amici curiae of Mozilla Corp., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 25 2019Amicus brief of Red Hat, Inc. not accepted for filing. (March 11, 2019)(Corrected version submitted).
Feb 25 2019Brief amicus curiae of Red Hat, Inc. filed.(3/11/2019)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2019Brief of respondent Oracle America, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 10 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2019.
Apr 10 2019Reply of petitioner Google LLC, filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 29 2019The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Sep 27 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 16 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Oct 16 2019Supplemental brief of petitioner Google LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/8/2019.
Nov 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 15 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by 78 Computer Scientists GRANTED.
Nov 15 2019Petition GRANTED.
Nov 22 2019Letter requesting permission to file the joint appendix under the deferred method filed.
Main Document
Dec 05 2019The Clerk has approved the deferred method for filing of the joint appendix per Rule 26.4.
Dec 05 2019Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Dec 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including January 6, 2020. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including February 12, 2020.
Dec 16 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Google LLC.
Blanket Consent
Jan 06 2020Brief of petitioner Google LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 07 2020Brief amici curiae of Civ Pro, IP & Legal History Professors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of Glynn Lunney filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2020Brief amicus curiae of Michael Risch filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Center for Democracy and Technology, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Professors Peter S. Menell, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2020Brief amici curiae of Copyright Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Rimini Street, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of The Robert Rauschenberg Foundation et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Computer & Communications Industry Association and Internet Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Developers Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Microsoft Corporation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Intellectual Property Law Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of International Business Machines Corp. et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Small, Medium, and Open Source Technology Organizations filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Auto Care Association and Static Control Components, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Python Software Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Eighty Three Computer Scientists filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of R Street Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Retail Litigation Center, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Engine Advocacy filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Seventy Two Intellectual Property Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of American Antitrust Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Software and System Developers and Engineers for United States Government Agencies filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Software Innovators, Startups, and Investors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Software Freedom Law Center filed. (1/17/2020)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 13 2020Brief amici curiae of The American Library Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 13 2020Amicus brief of Empirical Legal Researchers submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 14 2020Amicus brief of Software Freedom Law Center submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas C. Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave.
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tgoldstein@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Google LLC
Kannon K. ShanmugamPaul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Google LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: Oracle America, Inc.
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Jonathan Band
    Counsel of Record
Jonathan Band PLLC
21 Dupont Circle NW Suite 800
Washington, DC 20036

jband@policybandwidth.com
202-296-5675
Party name: Computer & Communications Industry Association and Internet Association
Michael Barclay
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Frontier Foundation
815 Eddy Street
San Francisco, CA 94109

michael@eff.org
415-436-9333
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Christopher Theodore Bavitz
    Counsel of Record
Cyberlaw Clinic, Harvard Law School
1585 Massachusetts, Ave, Suite WCC 5018
Cambridge, MA 02138

cbavitz@law.harvard.edu
6174965155
Party name: Eight Intellectual Property Scholars
Andrew Phillip Bridges
    Counsel of Record
Fenwick & West, LLP
801 California Street
Silicon Valley Center
Mountain View, CA 94041

abridges@fenwick.com
(415) 875-2389
Party name: Software and System Developers and Engineers for United States Government Agencies
Brandon Collins Butler
    Counsel of Record
University of Virginia
PO Box 400152
Charlottesville, VA 22904

bcb4y@virginia.edu
434-982-5874
Party name: The American Library Association, The Association Of Research Libraries, The Association Of College And Research Libraries, And The Software Preservation Network
Joseph Carl Cecere
    Counsel of Record
Cecere, PC
6035 McCommas Blvd.
Dallas, TX 75206

ccecere@cecerepc.com
469-600-9455
Party name: Software Innovators, Startups, and Investors
Jaclyn Fabean Cherry
    Counsel of Record
University of South Carolina School of Law
1525 Senate Street
Columbia, SC 29208

Cherryja@law.sc.edu
803-777-3394
Party name: Civ Pro, IP & Legal History Professors in Support of Petitioner
Catherine Newby Crump
    Counsel of Record
Samuelson Clinic for Law, Technology & Public Policy
University of California, Berkeley, School of Law
353 Boalt Hall
Berkely, CA 94720

ccrump@law.berkeley.edu
5102926860
Party name: Seventy Two Intellectual Property Scholars
James Wilson Dabney
    Counsel of Record
Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP
One Battery Park Plaza
New York, NY 10004

james.dabney@hugheshubbard.com
2128376803
Party name: International Business Machines Corp. and Red Hat, Inc.
Charles Duan
    Counsel of Record
R Street Institute
1212 New York Ave NW Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

supremecourt.gov@cduan.com
(202) 525-5717
Party name: R Street Institute and Public Knowledge
Joseph Charles Gratz
    Counsel of Record
Durie Tangri LLP
217 Leidesdorff Street
San Francisco, CA 94111

jgratz@durietangri.com
415-362-6666
Party name: Center for Democracy and Technology, Institute For Intellectual Property & Social Justice, National Consumers League, and National Federation of the Blind
Seth D. Greenstein
    Counsel of Record
Constantine Cannon LLP
1001 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Suite 1300 North
Washington, DC 20004

sgreenstein@constantinecannon.com
202-204-3514
Party name: Auto Care Association and Static Control Components, Inc.
Ian Marc Herman
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, LLP
150 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017

elie.herman@wilsonelser.com
2129155724
Party name: Empirical Legal Researchers
James Harold Hulme
    Counsel of Record
Arent Fox LLP
1717 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006-5344

james.hulme@arentfox.com
2028576144
Party name: Developers Alliance
Jeffrey Alan Lamken
    Counsel of Record
Mololamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 660
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
202-556-2000
Party name: Microsoft Corporation
Joseph Glynn Stephen Lunney Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Texas A&M University School of Law
1515 Commerce Street
FORT WORTH, TX 76102-6509

glunney@law.tamu.edu
8172123932
Party name: Glynn Lunney
Phillip Robert Malone
    Counsel of Record
Juelsgaard Intellectual Property and Innovation Clinic
Mills Legal Clinic at Stanford Law School
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

pmalone@law.stanford.edu
650-725-6369
Party name: Eighty Three Computer Scientists
Jonathan S. Massey
    Counsel of Record
Massey & Gail LLP
1000 Maine Avenue SW
Suite 450
Washington, DC 20024

jmassey@masseygail.com
202-652-4511
Party name: Retail Litigation Center, Inc.
Peter S. Menell
    Counsel of Record
University of California, Berkeley School of Law
University of California, Berkeley School of Law
225 Bancroft Way
Berkeley, CA 94720-7200

pmenell@law.berkeley.edu
5106425489
Party name: Professors Peter S. Menell, David Nimmer and Shyamkrishna Balganesh
Eben Moglen
    Counsel of Record
Columbia Law School
435 West 116th Street
New York, NY 10027

moglen@columbia.edu
(212) 854-8382
Party name: Software Freedom Law Center
Jennifer Librach Nall
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts L.L.P.
98 San Jacinto Boulevard, Suite 1500
Austin, TX 78701

jennifer.nall@bakerbotts.com
5123222507
Party name: American Intellectual Property Law Association
Jeffrey Theodore Pearlman
    Counsel of Record
IP & Technology Law Clinic, USC Gould School of Law
699 Exposition Blvd.
Los Angeles, CA 90089-0071

jef@law.usc.edu
213-740-7088
Party name: Engine Advocacy
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036-5306

mperry@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3667
Party name: Rimini Street, Inc.
Michael Victor Risch
    Counsel of Record
Villanova University Charles Widger School of Law
299 N. Spring Mill Rd.
Villanova, PA 19085

mrisch@alumni.stanford.edu
6504442238
Party name: Michael Risch
John Paul Schnapper-Casteras
    Counsel of Record
Schnapper-Casteras PLLC
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

jpsc@schnappercasteras.com
2026303644
Party name: The Robert Rauschenberg Foundation et al.
Jason M. Schultz
    Counsel of Record
New York University School of Law
245 Sullivan Street
Room 609
New York, NY 10012

jason.schultz@law.nyu.edu
212-992-7365
Party name: Small, Medium, and Open Source Technology Organizations
Jason M. Schultz
    Counsel of Record
New York University School of Law
245 Sullivan Street
Room 609
New York, NY 10012

jason.schultz@law.nyu.edu
510-390-0237
Party name: Mozilla Corp., et al.
Randy M. Stutz
    Counsel of Record
American Antitrust Institute
1025 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20036

rstutz@antitrustinstitute.org
2029055420
Party name: American Antitrust Institute
Rebecca Leah Tushnet
    Counsel of Record
Harvard Law School
1575 Massachusetts Ave.
Hauser 520
Cambridge, MA 02138

rtushnet@law.harvard.edu
7035936759
Party name: Copyright Scholars
Jill Margaret Wheaton
    Counsel of Record
Dykema Gossett, PLLC
112E. Pecan St., #1800
San Antonio, TX 78215

jwheaton@dykema.com
210-554-5294
Party name: Python Software Foundation and Tidelift

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543