Jul 03 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 8, 2018) |
| PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Jul 30 2018 | Waiver of right of respondent Quentin T. Chute to respond filed. |
| Main Document |
Aug 22 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018. |
| |
Aug 27 2018 | Response Requested. (Due September 26, 2018) |
| |
Sep 14 2018 | Brief of respondent Quentin T. Chute in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of Service |
Sep 14 2018 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Quentin T. Chute. |
| Main Document |
Sep 28 2018 | Reply of petitioner Minnesota filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Oct 03 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018. |
| |
Oct 29 2018 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. |
| |
Oct 29 2018 | Petition DENIED. |
| |