Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 18-1124
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 18-1124
Title:Stephens Institute, dba Academy of Art University, Petitioner
v.
United States, ex rel. Scott Rose, et al.
Docketed:February 28, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-15111)
   Decision Date:November 26, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 25 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 1, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2019Waiver of right of respondents United States ex rel Scott Rose, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2019.
Apr 01 2019Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Steven M. Gombos
    Counsel of Record
Gombos Leyton, P.C.
11350 Random Hills Road
Suite 400
Fairfax, VA 22030

sgombos@glpclaw.com
(703) 934-2660
Party name: Stephens Institute, dba Academy of Art University
Attorneys for Respondents
Stephen Richard Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
The Jaffe Law Firm
101 California Street
Suite 2710
San Francisco, CA 94111

stephen.r.jaffe@jaffetriallaw.com
4156180100
Party name: Scott Rose, Mary Aquino, Mitchell Nelson, Lucy Stearns
Michael J. von Loewenfeldt
    Counsel of Record
Wagstaffe, von Loewenfeldt, Busch & Radwick LLP
100 Pine Street, Suite 725
San Francisco, CA 94111

mvl@kerrwagstaffe.com
(415) 357-8900
Party name: United States ex rel Scott Rose, Mary Aquino, Mitchell Nelson, and Lucy Stearns

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543