SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
498 items found. Page: 1 of 72 for your search: Rodney reed
<< First
< Previous
Next >
Last >>
Search Results:
19-411 Reed v. Texas (02/24/2020)
of SOTOMAYOR, J. SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES
RODNEY
REED
v. TEXAS ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI TO THE
21-442 Reed v. Goertz (04/19/2023)
Decided April 19, 2023 A Texas jury found petitioner
Rodney
Reed
guilty of the 1996 murder of Stacey Stites theTexas Court of Criminal Appeals denied
Reed’s
motion
598us1r12_l5gm.pdf
Decided April 19, 2023 A Texas jury found petitioner
Rodney
Reed
guilty of the 1996 murder of Stacey Stites the Texas Court of Criminal Appeals denied
Reed's
motion
Day Call, Tuesday, October 11, 2022
RIDERLONGMAID Washington, D. C. No. 21-442. (2)
RODNEY
REED
, Petitioner V. 1 hour for argument. MR. JUDD E. STONE
Order List (02/24/2020)
(ORDER LIST: 589 U.S.) MONDAY, FEBRUARY 24, 2020 CERTIORARI --SUMMARY DISPOSITIONS 19-568 AZANO MATSURA, JOSE S. V. UNITED STATES The petition for a writ of certiorari is granted. The judgment is
Hearing List October 2022
D. C. (70 minutes for argument.) No. 21–442.
Rodney
Reed
v. Bryan Goertz. Certiorari to the C. A. 5th
21-442_ca7d.pdf
IN THE SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES
RODNEY
REED
, ) Petitioner, ) v. ) No. 21-442 BRYAN GOERTZ, ) Respondent
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##