Title:William Allen Davis, Petitioner v. Colorado |
Rehearing Denied: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 9, 2024 Waiver of right of respondent Colorado to respond filed. Response Requested. (Due May 23, 2024
| Tasha Mercedez Shelby, Petitioner v. Mississippi |
Rehearing Denied: Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 10, 2024 Response Requested. (Due April 29, 2024
| Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, Petitioner v. Azucena Aracely Lazo-Gavidia, et al. |
United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 10, 2024 Response Requested. (Due February 28, 2024
| 835 Hinesburg Road, LLC, Petitioner v. City of South Burlington, Vermont, et al. |
City of South Burlington, Vermont, et Application (23A524) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 6, 2024 to March 20, 2024 Response Requested. (Due May 20, 2024
| Emiliano Emmanuel Flores-González, Petitioner v. United States |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 8, 2024 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
| Nardino Colotti, et al., Petitioners v. United States |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 11, 2024 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
| Tiger Cela, Petitioner v. Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General |
United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 26, 2024 Response Requested. (Due March 7, 2024
|