No. 16-917 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | January 23, 2017 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-56440) |
Decision Date: | August 4, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 13, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 9 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 22, 2017) |
Feb 22 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of The Government of Japan filed. |
Feb 22 2017 | Brief of respondent City of Glendale, California in opposition filed. |
Feb 22 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of The Society for Dissemination of Historical Fact & Nippon Today's Researchers Society (Kingen) filed. |
Mar 8 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 24, 2017. |
Mar 13 2017 | Reply of petitioners Koichi Mera, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Mar 27 2017 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
William Benjamin DeClercq | 225 South Lake Avenue | 626-408-2150 |
Counsel of Record | Suite 300 | |
Pasadena, CA 91101 | ||
William@DeClercqLaw.com | ||
Party name: Koichi Mera, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Mark E. Haddad | Sidley Austin LLP | (213) 896-6000 |
Counsel of Record | 555 W. Fifth Street, 40th Floor | |
Los Angeles, CA 90013 | ||
mhaddad@sidley.com | ||
Party name: City of Glendale, California | ||
Other: | ||
Jessica L. Ellsworth | Hogan Lovells US LLP | (202) 637-5886 |
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20004 | ||
jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com | ||
Party name: The Government of Japan |