No. 16-814 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | December 28, 2016 | |||
Linked with 16A353 | ||||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces |
Case Nos.: | (15-0510, 16-0223) |
Decision Date: | August 10, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 11 2016 | Application (16A353) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 8, 2016 to December 23, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Oct 12 2016 | Application (16A353) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 23, 2016. |
Dec 23 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 27, 2017) |
Jan 4 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. |
Jan 11 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017. |
Jan 13 2017 | Response Requested . (Due February 13, 2017) |
Jan 13 2017 | Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or neither party, received from counsel for petitioner. |
Jan 27 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Texas, et al. filed. |
Jan 27 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of LTC Kamal S. Kalsi, D.O., U.S.A.R. filed. |
Jan 27 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Chaplain Alliance for Religious Liberty, et al. filed. |
Feb 8 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 15, 2017. |
Feb 10 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed. |
Feb 13 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Dr. S. Simcha Goldman filed. |
Feb 13 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Retired Generals filed. |
Feb 13 2017 | Brief amici curiae of 36 Members of Congress filed. |
Feb 14 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of The Military Religious Freedom Foundation filed. |
Mar 14 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including April 12, 2017. |
Apr 12 2017 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
May 1 2017 | Reply of petitioner Monifa J. Sterling filed. |
May 2 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 18, 2017. |
May 16 2017 | Rescheduled. |
May 22 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 25, 2017. |
May 23 2017 | Rescheduled. |
May 30 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 1, 2017. |
Jun 5 2017 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Paul D. Clement | Kirkland & Ellis LLP | (202) 879-5000 |
Counsel of Record | 655 Fifteenth Street, N.W. | |
Washington, DC 20005 | ||
paul.clement@kirkland.com | ||
Party name: Monifa J. Sterling | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Jeffrey B. Wall | Acting Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice | |
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: United States | ||
Other: | ||
Brian D. Boyle | O'Melveny & Myers, LLP | (202) 383-5300 |
1625 Eye Street, NW | ||
Washington, DC 20006 | ||
bboyle@omm.com | ||
Party name: LTC Kamal S. Kalsi, D.O., U.S.A.R. | ||
Kimberlee Wood Colby | Christian Legal Society | (703) 894-1087 |
8001 Braddock Rd., Suite 302 | ||
Springfield, VA 22151 | ||
kcolby@clsnet.org | ||
Party name: Chaplain Alliance for Religious Liberty, et al. | ||
John A. Eidsmoe | Foundation for Moral Law | (334) 262-1245 |
One Dexter Avenue | ||
Montgomery, AL 36104 | ||
eidsmoeja@juno.com | ||
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law | ||
Kyle Douglas Hawkins | Gibson, Dunn, & Crutcher, LLP | (214) 698-3100 |
2100 McKinney Ave., Suite 1100 | ||
Dallas, TX 75201 | ||
khawkins@gibsondunn.com | ||
Party name: Monifa J. Sterling v. United States | ||
Sean D. Jordan | Jackson Walker, LLP | (512) 236-2281 |
100 Congress Avenue, Suite 1100 | ||
Austin, TX 78701 | ||
sjordan@jw.com | ||
Party name: 36 Members of Congress | ||
Scott A. Keller | Solicitor General | (512) 936-1700 |
Office of the Attorney General | ||
P.O. Box 12548 Capitol Station (MC 059) | ||
Austin, TX 78711-2548 | ||
scott.keller@oag.texas.gov | ||
Party name: Texas, et al. | ||
Donald G. Rehkopf Jr. | Brenna Boyce, PLLC | (585) 454-2000 |
31 East Main Street | ||
Suite 2000 | ||
Rochester, NY 14614 | ||
drehkopfjr@brennalaw.com | ||
Party name: The Military Religious Freedom Foundation | ||
Aaron M. Streett | Baker Botts, L.L.P. | (713) 229-1855 |
910 Louisiana Street | ||
Houston, TX 77002 | ||
aaron.streett@bakerbotts.com | ||
Party name: Retired Generals |