~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 11 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 12, 2016) |
Jul 19 2016 |
Waiver of right of respondents Daniel T. Pauly, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Samuel Pauly, Deceased, et al. to respond filed. |
Aug 3 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Aug 3 2016 |
Response Requested . (Due September 2, 2016) |
Aug 12 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 3, 2016. |
Oct 3 2016 |
Brief of respondents Daniel T. Pauly, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Samuel Pauly, Deceased, et al. in opposition filed. |
Oct 17 2016 |
Reply of petitioners Ray White, Michael Mariscal, and Kevin Truesdale. filed. |
Oct 19 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 4, 2016. |
Nov 7 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 10, 2016. |
Nov 14 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 22, 2016. |
Nov 28 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 2, 2016. |
Dec 5 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 9, 2016. |
Dec 27 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017. |
Jan 9 2017 |
Petition GRANTED Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Opinion per curiam. Justice Ginsburg concurring. (Detached Opinion) |