No. 16-602     *** CAPITAL CASE ***  
Title:
Thomas D. Arthur, Petitioner
v.
Jefferson S. Dunn, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, et al.
Docketed:November 3, 2016
Linked with 16A451
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(16-15549)
  Decision Date:November 2, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 3 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 5, 2016)
Nov 3 2016 Application (16A451) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Nov 3 2016 Motion for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari under seal with redacted copies for the public record filed.
Nov 3 2016 Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Certain Medical Professionals and Medical Ethicists.
Nov 3 2016 Brief of respondent Jefferson S. Dunn, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, et al. in opposition filed.
Nov 3 2016 Reply of petitioner Thomas D. Arthur filed.
Nov 3 2016 UPON CONSIDERATION of the application of counsel for the applicant, IT IS ORDERED that execution of the sentence of death is hereby stayed pending further order of Justice Thomas or of the Court.
Nov 3 2016 Application (16A451) referred to the Court.
Nov 3 2016 Application (16A451) granted by the Court. The application for stay of execution of sentence of death presented to Justice Thomas and by him referred to the Court is granted pending the disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. Statement of The Chief Justice respecting the grant of the application for stay. I do not believe that this application meets our ordinary criteria for a stay. This case does not merit the Courtís review: the claims set out in the application are purely fact-specific, dependent on contested interpretations of state law, insulated from our review by alternative holdings below, or some combination of the three. Four Justices have, however, voted to grant a stay. To afford them the opportunity to more fully consider the suitability of this case for review, including these circumstances, I vote to grant the stay as a courtesy. Justice Thomas and Justice Alito would deny the application.
Nov 7 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 22, 2016.
Nov 8 2016 Rescheduled.
Nov 15 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 2, 2016.
Nov 23 2016 Rescheduled.
Dec 5 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 9, 2016.
Dec 27 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017.
Jan 9 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017.
Jan 17 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 19, 2017.
Feb 6 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017.
Feb 21 2017 Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Certain Medical Professionals and Medical Ethicists GRANTED.
Feb 21 2017 Petition DENIED. Justice Sotomayor with whom Justice Breyer joins, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)
Mar 20 2017 Petition for Rehearing filed.
Apr 5 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017.
Apr 7 2017 Supplemental brief to petition for rehearing filed. (Distributed)
Apr 17 2017 Second supplemental brief of petitioner Thomas D. Arthur filed. (Distributed)
Apr 18 2017 Third supplemental brief of petitioner Thomas D. Arthur filed. (Distributed)
Apr 24 2017 Rehearing DENIED Justice Sotomayor would grant the petition for rehearing.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Suhana S. Han 125 Broad Street (212) 558-4000
    Counsel of RecordNew York, NY  10004
HanS@Sullcrom.com
Party name: Thomas D. Arthur
Attorneys for Respondents:
James R. Houts AL Office of the Attorney General(334) 353-1513
    Counsel of Record501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL  36130
jhouts@ago.state.al.us
Party name: Jefferson S. Dunn, Commissioner, Alabama Department of Corrections, et al.
Other:
Daniel Thomas Fenske 353 North Clark Street 312-840-7301
Chicago, IL  60654-3456
dfenske@jenner.com
Party name: Certain Medical Professionals and Medical Ethicists