No. 16-242 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | August 24, 2016 | |||
Linked with 16A32 | ||||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-51343) |
Decision Date: | April 21, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 7 2016 | Application (16A32) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 20, 2016 to August 19, 2016, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Jul 14 2016 | Application (16A32) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 19, 2016. |
Aug 19 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 23, 2016) |
Sep 1 2016 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 24, 2016, for all respondents. |
Oct 24 2016 | Brief of respondent Fine Wine & Spirits of North Texas, LLC in opposition filed. |
Oct 24 2016 | Brief of respondent Southern Glazer's Wine and Spirits of Texas II, LLC in opposition filed. |
Nov 7 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 22, 2016. |
Nov 7 2016 | Reply of petitioner Texas Package Stores Association, Inc. filed. (Distributed) |
Nov 28 2016 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
David C. Frederick | Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, P.L.L.C. | (202) 326-7900 |
Counsel of Record | 1615 M Street, N.W., Suite 400 | |
Washington, DC 20036 | ||
dfrederick@khhte.com | ||
Party name: Texas Package Stores Association, Inc. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
James C. Ho | Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP | (214) 698-3100 |
Counsel of Record | 2100 McKinney Avenue | |
Suite 1100 | ||
Dallas, TX 75201-6912 | ||
JHo@gibsondunn.com | ||
Party name: Fine Wine & Spirits of North Texas, LLC | ||
Neal Kumar Katyal | Hogan Lovells US LLP | (202) 637-5600 |
Counsel of Record | 555 Thirteenth Street, N.W. | |
Washington, DC 20004 | ||
neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com | ||
Party name: Southern Glazer's Wine and Spirits of Texas II, LLC |