No. 16-1085 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | March 9, 2017 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (15-20084) |
Decision Date: | January 11, 2017 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 8 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 10, 2017) |
Mar 23 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 10, 2017. |
May 10 2017 | Brief of respondents Pelican Tank Parts, Inc., et al. in opposition filed. |
May 30 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 15, 2017. |
May 30 2017 | Reply of petitioner Ultraflo Corporation filed. (Distributed) |
Jun 19 2017 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Paul W. Hughes | Mayer Brown LLP | (202) 263-3000 |
Counsel of Record | 1999 K Street NW | |
Washington, DC 20006-1101 | ||
phughes@mayerbrown.com | ||
Party name: Ultraflo Corporation | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
John Karl Buche | Buche & Associates, P.C. | (858) 459-9111 |
875 Prospect St., Suite 305 | ||
La Jolla, CA 92037 | ||
jbuche@buchelaw.com | ||
Party name: Pelican Tank Parts, Inc., et al. |