No. 15A880
Title:
June Medical Services, L.L.C., et al., Applicants
v.
Rebekah Gee, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals
Docketed:February 26, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(16-30116)

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Feb 26 2016 Application (15A880) to vacate stay, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Feb 29 2016 Response to application (15A880) requested by Justice Thomas, due Wednesday, March 2, 2016, by 3:00 p.m. ET.
Mar 2 2016 Response to application from respondent Rebekah Gee, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals filed.
Mar 3 2016 Reply of applicant June Medical Services, L.L.C., et al. filed.
Mar 3 2016 Motion for leave to file amicus brief and motion for leave to file brief pursuant to Rule 33.2 filed by Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund.
Mar 4 2016 Application (15A880) referred to the Court.
Mar 4 2016 Application (15A880) granted by the Court. Consistent with the Courtís action granting a stay in Whole Womanís Health v. Cole, No. 14A1288 (June 29, 2015), the application to vacate the stay entered by the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit on February 24, 2016, presented to Justice Thomas and by him referred to the Court, is granted and the Fifth Circuitís stay of the district courtís injunction is vacated. Justice Thomas would deny the application.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
David Patrick Brown Center for Reproductive Rights (917) 637-3653
    Counsel of Record199 Water Street, 22nd Floor
New York, NY  10038
Party name: June Medical Services, L.L.C., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent:
S. Kyle Duncan Schaerr l Duncan LLP(202) 714-9492; (202) 787-1060
1717 K Street, NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC  20006
Party name: Rebekah Gee, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals
Other:
Lawrence J. Joseph 1250 Connecticut Ave., NW(202) 355-9452
Suite 200
Washington, DC  20036
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund