No. 15-862
Title:
Stormans, Inc., dba Ralph's Thirftway, et al., Petitioners
v.
John Wiesman, Secretary, Washington State Department of Health, et al.
Docketed:January 6, 2016
Linked with 15A512
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(12-35221, 12-35223)
  Decision Date:July 23, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:September 10, 2015

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 9 2015 Application (15A512) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 9, 2015 to January 4, 2016, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Nov 13 2015 Application (15A512) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until January 4, 2016.
Jan 4 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 5, 2016)
Jan 12 2016 Blanket consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioners and counsel for the respondents .
Jan 15 2016 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 7, 2016, for all respondents.
Feb 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society, et al. filed.
Feb 4 2016 Brief amici curiae of American Association of Prolife Obstetricians & Gynecologists, et al. filed.
Feb 4 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Feb 5 2016 Brief amici curiae of 4,609 Individual Healthcare Professionals filed.
Feb 5 2016 Brief amici curiae of International Society for Krishna Consciousness, et al. filed.
Feb 5 2016 Brief amici curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al. filed.
Feb 5 2016 Brief amicus curiae of Agudath Israel of America filed.
Feb 5 2016 Brief amici curiae of Public Advocate of the United States, et al. filed.
Feb 5 2016 Brief amici curiae of National and State Pharmacists' Associations filed.
Feb 5 2016 Brief amici curiae of The Bruderhof and The National Committee for Amish Religious Freedom filed.
Feb 5 2016 Brief amici curiae of National Association of Evangelicals, et al. filed.
Feb 5 2016 Brief amici curiae of The States of Arizona, et al. filed.
Feb 5 2016 Brief amici curiae of Religious Liberty Scholars filed.
Feb 5 2016 Brief amici curiae of 43 Members of Congress filed.
Mar 7 2016 Brief of respondents Intervenor repondents in opposition filed.
Mar 7 2016 Brief of respondents John Wiesman, Secretary, Washington State Department of Health, et al. in opposition filed.
Mar 21 2016 Reply of petitioners Stormans, Inc., dba Ralph's Thirftway, et al. filed.
Mar 23 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 15, 2016.
Apr 13 2016 Rescheduled.
Apr 18 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 22, 2016.
Apr 20 2016 Rescheduled.
Apr 25 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 29, 2016.
Apr 27 2016 Rescheduled.
May 9 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 12, 2016.
May 16 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 19, 2016.
May 19 2016 Record Requested .
May 23 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 26, 2016.
May 26 2016 Record received from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit. The record is electronic.
May 26 2016 Record received from the U.S.D.C. Western District of Washington. The record is electronic and contains sealed materials.
May 31 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 2, 2016.
Jun 6 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 9, 2016.
Jun 13 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 16, 2016.
Jun 20 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 23, 2016.
Jun 27 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 27, 2016.
Jun 28 2016 Petition DENIED. Justice Alito, with whom The Chief Justice and Justice Thomas join, dissenting from the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Kristen K. Waggoner Alliance Defending Freedom(480) 444-0020
    Counsel of Record15100 N. 90th Street
Scottsdale, AZ  85260
kwaggoner@ADFlegal.org
Party name: Stormans, Inc., dba Ralph's Thirftway, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Thomas L. Boeder Perkins Coie LLP(206) 359-8000
    Counsel of Record1201 Third Ave., Suite 4900
Seattle, WA  98101
TBoeder@perkinscoie.com
Party name: Intervenor repondents
 
Alan D. Copsey Deputy Solicitor General(360) 664-9018
    Counsel of Record 1125 Washington Street SE
Olympia, WA  98504-0100
alan.copsey@atg.wa.gov
Party name: John Wiesman, Secretary, Washington State Department of Health, et al.
Other:
Dorinda C. Bordlee Bioethics Defense Fund(504) 231-7234
3312 Cleary Avenue
Metairie, LA  70002
dbordlee@bdfund.org
Party name: American Association of Prolife Obstetricians & Gynecologists, et al.
 
Anthony T. Caso Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence(714) 628-2666
c/o Dale E. Fowler School of Law at Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA  92886
caso@chapman.edu
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
 
Kimberlee Wood Colby Christian Legal Society(703) 894-1087
8001 Braddock Rd., Suite 302
Springfield, VA  22151
kcolby@clsnet.org
Party name: Christian Legal Society, et al.
 
Richard Shawn Gunnarson Kiront McConckie(801) 328-3600
1800 World Trade Center
60 East South Temple Street
Salt Lake City, UT  84111
sgunnarson@kmclaw.com
Party name: National Association of Evangelicals, et al.
 
Sean D. Jordan Jackson Walker, LLP(512) 236-2281
100 Congress Avenue, Suite 1100
Austin, TX  78701
sjordan@jw.com
Party name: 43 Members of Congress
 
Douglas Laycock University of Virginia School of Law(434) 243-8546
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA  22903
dlaycock@virginia.edu
Party name: Religious Liberty Scholars
 
John Robert Lopez IV. Solicitor General(602) 542-3333
1275 West Washington Street
Phoenix, AZ  85007
John.Lopez@azag.gov
Party name: The States of Arizona, et al.
 
Charles Kevin. Marshall Jones Day(202) 879-3939
51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20001
ckmarshall@jonesday.com
Party name: International Society for Krishna Consciousness, et al.
 
Matthew T. Nelson Warner Norcross & Judd LLP(616) 752-2000
900 Fifth Third Center
111 Lyon Street, N.W.
Grand Rapids, MI  49503
mnelson@wnj.com
Party name: The Bruderhof and The National Committee for Amish Religious Freedom
 
William J. Olson William J.Olson, P.C.(703) 356-5070
370 Maple Avenue West, Suite 4
Vienna, VA  22180-5615
wjo@mindspring.com
Party name: Public Advocate of the United States, et al.
 
D. John Sauer James Otis Law Group LLC(314) 854-1372
231 S. Benniston Ave., Suite 800
St. Louis, MO  63105
jsauer@jamesotis.com
Party name: 4,609 Individual Healthcare Professionals
 
Gene C. Schaerr Schaerr l Duncan, LLP(202) 787-1060
1717 K Street, NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC  20006
gschaerr@schaerr-duncan.com
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops, et al.
 
Evan A. Young Baker Botts LLP(512) 322-2506
98 San Jacinto Boulevard
Suite 1500
Austin, TX  78701-4078
evan.young@bakerbotts.com
Party name: National and State Pharmacists' Associations
 
Todd Cornelius Zubler Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr, LLP(202) 663-6000
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
todd.zuber@wilmerhale.com
Party name: Agudath Israel of America