No. 14-1044 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | February 26, 2015 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-10409) |
Decision Date: | August 19, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 9, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 25 2015 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 30, 2015) |
Mar 25 2015 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 29, 2015. |
Mar 30 2015 | Brief amici curiae of National Center for Lesbian Rights and Immigration Equality filed. |
Apr 24 2015 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 20, 2015. |
May 11 2015 | Motion to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46 received. |
May 13 2015 | Letter of consent to the motion to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46 received. |
May 13 2015 | Petition Dismissed - Rule 46. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Peter D. Keisler | Sidley Austin LLP | (202) 736-8000 |
1501 K Street, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20005 | ||
pkeisler@sidley.com | ||
Party name: Biuma Claudine Malu | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
United States Department of Justice | ||
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: Loretta E. Lynch, Attorney General | ||
Other: | ||
Douglas Hallward-Driemeier | Ropes & Gray LLP | (202) 508-4776 |
700 12th Street, N.W., Suite 900 | ||
Washington, DC 20005 | ||
Douglas.Hallward-Driemeier@ropesgray.com | ||
Party name: National Center for Lesbian Rights and Immigration Equality |