No. 13-568 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | November 7, 2013 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-1501) |
Decision Date: | July 31, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 29 2013 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 9, 2013) |
Oct 29 2013 | Supplemental Appendix of Patricia A. Bankert, Individually and in Her Capacity as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jonathan W. Bankert, Sr., et al. filed. |
Nov 26 2013 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 19, 2013. |
Dec 18 2013 | Brief of respondents Norman W. Bernstein, and Peter M. Racher, as Trustees in opposition filed. |
Jan 3 2014 | Reply of petitioners Patricia A. Bankert, Individually and in Her Capacity as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jonathan W. Bankert, Sr., et al. filed. |
Jan 8 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 24, 2014. |
Jan 27 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Robert Marc Chemers | Pretzel & Stouffer, Chartered | (312) 346-1973 |
Counsel of Record | One South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500 | |
Chicago, IL 60606 | ||
rchemers@pretzel-stouffer.com | ||
Party name: Patricia A. Bankert, Individually and in Her Capacity as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jonathan W. Bankert, Sr., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Norman W. Bernstein | N.W. Bernstein & Associates LLC | (914)-358-3500 |
Counsel of Record | 800 Westchester Avenue | |
Suite N319 | ||
Rye Brook, NY 10573 | ||
nwbernstein@nwbllc.com | ||
Party name: Norman W. Bernstein, and Peter M. Racher, as Trustees |