No. 13-107 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | July 25, 2013 | |||
Linked with 12A1050 | ||||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-5717) |
Decision Date: | November 6, 2012 |
Rehearing Denied: | February 22, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 26 2013 | Application (12A1050) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 23, 2013 to July 22, 2013, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
May 1 2013 | Application (12A1050) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 22, 2013. |
Jul 22 2013 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 26, 2013) |
Aug 26 2013 | Brief of respondents Baptist Memorial Health Care Corporation, et al. in opposition filed. |
Sep 11 2013 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2013. |
Oct 7 2013 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Alan G. Crone | 5583 Murray Road | |
Suite 120 | ||
Memphis, TN 38119 | ||
acrone@thecmfirm.com | ||
Party name: Margaret White | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Paul E. Prather | Littler Mendelson, P.C. | (901)-795-6695 |
Counsel of Record | 3725 Champion Hills Drive, Suite 3000 | |
Memphis, TN 38125 | ||
pprather@littler.com | ||
Party name: Baptist Memorial Health Care Corporation, et al. |