No. 12-160 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | August 3, 2012 | |||
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District |
Case Nos.: | (B241477) |
Decision Date: | June 6, 2012 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | July 25, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 1 2012 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 3, 2012) |
Sep 19 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 5, 2012. |
Oct 9 2012 | Petition DENIED. |
Nov 5 2012 | Petition for Rehearing filed. |
Nov 20 2012 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 7, 2012. |
Dec 10 2012 | Rehearing DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Yossi Zaga | P.O. Box 261307 | (213) 309-4600 |
Encino, CA 91426 | ||
yossi@apwla.com | ||
Party name: Yossi Zaga |