No. 11-5844 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | August 17, 2011 | |||
Lower Ct: | Superior Court of New Jersey, Appellate Division |
Case Nos.: | (A-5641-08T4) |
Decision Date: | January 26, 2011 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | June 18, 2011 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 25 2011 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 16, 2011) |
Aug 16 2011 | Waiver of right of respondent New Jersey to respond filed. |
Sep 1 2011 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2011. |
Oct 3 2011 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Addisabeth Pryce | #496112 | |
Edna Mahan Correctional Facility | ||
P. O. Box 4004 - SIS | ||
Clinton, NJ 08809 | ||
Party name: Addisabeth Pryce | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Joie Piderit | Middlesex County Prosecutor's Office | (732) 745-3300 |
Counsel of Record | 25 Kirkpatrick Street, 3rd Floor | |
New Brunswick, NJ 08901 | ||
Party name: New Jersey |