No. 11-567 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | November 4, 2011 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (09-16573) |
Decision Date: | August 22, 2011 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 2 2011 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 5, 2011) |
Dec 2 2011 | Waiver of right of respondents Maria Torres, et al. to respond filed. |
Dec 7 2011 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2012. |
Jan 9 2012 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Timothy T. Coates | Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP | (310) 859-7811 |
5900 Wilshire Blvd., 12th Floor | ||
Los Angeles, CA 90036 | ||
tcoates@gmsr.com | ||
Party name: Marcy Noriega | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Charles A. Rothfeld | Mayer Brown LLP | (202) 263-3000 |
Counsel of Record | 1999 K Street, N.W. | |
Washington, DC 20006-1101 | ||
crothfeld@mayerbrown.com | ||
Party name: Maria Torres, et al. |