No. 09-7660 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | November 20, 2009 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (09-2414, 09-2610) |
Decision Date: | August 31, 2009 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 2, 2009 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 17 2009 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 21, 2009) |
Jan 7 2010 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 22, 2010. |
Jan 25 2010 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Stephen Ulrich | 4028 Illinois | (309) 648-8839 |
Peoria Heights, IL 61616 | ||
Party name: Stephen Ulrich |