No. 08-6141 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | September 4, 2008 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (07-30863) |
Decision Date: | May 6, 2008 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 30 2008 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 6, 2008) |
Sep 22 2008 | Waiver of right of respondent Burl Cain, Warden to respond filed. |
Oct 2 2008 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 17, 2008. |
Oct 20 2008 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Eric Guilbeau | 462114 | |
Louisiana State Prison | ||
Mag-4 M/P | ||
Angola, LA 70712 | ||
Party name: Eric John Guilbeau | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Alisa Ardoin Gothreaux | Dristrict Attorney's Office | (337) 948-0551 |
Counsel of Record | P.O. Drawer 1968 | |
Opelousas, LA 70571 | ||
Party name: Burl Cain, Warden |