No. 03-5084 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | June 30, 2003 | |||
Lower Ct: | Appellate Court of Illinois, First District |
Case Nos.: | (1-99-2598) |
Decision Date: | May 13, 2002 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | April 2, 2003 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 23 2003 | Petition for writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 30, 2003) |
Aug 5 2003 | Waiver of right of respondent Illinois to respond filed. |
Aug 14 2003 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2003. |
Oct 6 2003 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Lisa Pounders | #K93200 | |
Counsel of Record | Dwight Correctional Center | |
P. O. Box 5001 | ||
Dwight, IL 60420-5001 | ||
Party name: Lisa Pounders | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Lisa Anne Hoffman | DuPage County State's Attorneys Office | (630) 407-8020 |
Counsel of Record | 503 N. County Farm Rd. | |
Wheaton, IL 60187 | ||
lisa.hoffman@dupageco.org | ||
Party name: Illinois |