~~Date~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 9 2000 | Application (A00-421) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ |
| of certiorari from November 22, 2000 to January 21, 2001, |
| submitted to Justice O'Connor. |
Nov 14 2000 | Application (A00-421) granted by Justice O'Connor extending the |
| time to file until December 22, 2000. |
Dec 22 2000 | Petition for writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 13, 2001) |
Dec 22 2000 | Appendix of petitioner filed. |
Mar 29 2001 | Waiver of right of respondent State Bar of California to respond |
| filed. |
Apr 2 2001 | Waiver of right of respondents California, et al. to respond filed. |
Apr 2 2001 | Waiver of right of respondent American Bar Association to respond |
| filed. |
Apr 2 2001 | Waiver of right of respondent Los Angeles County, CA to respond filed. |
Apr 2 2001 | Waiver of right of respondents Comic Relief, Inc., et al. to respond |
| filed. |
Apr 16 2001 | Waiver of right of respondent Home Box Office to respond filed. |
Apr 17 2001 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 10, 2001 |
Apr 23 2001 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Cherylynn Costner filed. |
May 14 2001 | Petition DENIED. |
| ******************************************************** |
Jun 8 2001 | Petition for rehearing filed. |
Jun 12 2001 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 28, 2001 |
Jun 27 2001 | X Supplemental brief of petitioner filed. |
Jun 29 2001 | Rehearing DENIED. |
| |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | | |
Cherylynn Costner | c/o America's Freedom Found. | 3239607704 |
| 1156 Central Avenue, # 700 | |
| Los Angeles, CA 90021 | |
Party name: Cherylynn Costner |
| | |
Attorneys for Respondent: | | |
Russell J. Frackman | Mitchell, Silbergerg & Knupp | 3103122000 |
| 11377 West Olympic Blvd. | |
| Los Angeles, CA 90064-1683 | |
Party name: Comic Relief, Inc., et al. |
| | |
James M. Harris | Sidley & Austin | 2138966000 |
| 555 West Fifth Street, #4000 | |
| Los Angeles, CA 90013-1010 | |
Party name: American Bar Association |
| | |
Martin S. Stein | Greines, Martin, et al. | 3108597811 |
| 9601 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 544 | |
| Beverly Hills, CA 90210-5207 | |
Party name: Los Angeles County, CA |
| | |
Patricia D. Scotlan | State Bar of California | 4155382333 |
| 180 Howard Street | |
| San Francisco, CA 94105-1639 | |
Party name: State Bar of California |
| | |
J. Rebecca Fletcher | Friedmann, O'Brien & Zarian | 2138617490 |
| 611 West Sixth St., 16th Floor | |
| Los Angeles, CA 90017 | |
Party name: Home Box Office |
| | |
Theodore B. Zinger | Office of the Attorney General | 2138978773 |
| 300 South Spring Street | |
| Los Angeles, CA 90013 | |
Party name: California, et al. |
| | |
Lloyd W. Pellmman | 648 Hall of Administration | 2139741943 |
| 500 West Temple Street | |
| Los Angeles, CA 90012 | |
Party name: County of Los Angeles |
| | |
Marie N. Moffatt | 180 Howard Street | 4155382270 |
| San Francisco, CA 94105-1639 | |
Party name: State Bar of California |
| | |
Robert C. O'Brien | Friedmann, O'Brien, et al. | 2138617490 |
| 611 West Sixth St., 16th Floor | |
| Los Angeles, CA 90017 | |
Party name: Home Box Office |
| | |
Bill Lockyer | 1300 I Street | 9163245437 |
| Suite 1740 | |
| Sacramento, CA 95814 | |
Party name: California |
| | |
John R. Brydon | Haines, Brydon & Lea | 8182446600 |
| 100 West Broadway, Suite 595 | |
| Long Beach, CA 90802 | |
Party name: Wellcome, Fienman & Applegate |
| | |
| | |