No. 16-545 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | October 21, 2016 | |||
Linked with 16A129 | ||||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-3565, 13-3636, 15-432, 15-441, 15-454, 15-477, 15-494, 15-498, 15-524, 15-537, 15-547, 15-551, 15-611, 15-620, 15-627, 15-733, 15-744, 15-778, 15-825, 15-830) |
Decision Date: | May 23, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 5 2016 | Application (16A129) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 21, 2016 to September 20, 2016, submitted to Justice Ginsburg. |
Aug 8 2016 | Application (16A129) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until September 20, 2016. |
Sep 9 2016 | Application (16A129) to extend further the time from September 20, 2016 to October 20, 2016, submitted to Justice Ginsburg. |
Sep 13 2016 | Application (16A129) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until October 20, 2016. |
Oct 20 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 21, 2016) |
Oct 28 2016 | Waiver of right of respondents Ellen Gelboim, et al. to respond filed. |
Nov 7 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 22, 2016. |
Nov 9 2016 | Response Requested . (Due December 9, 2016) |
Nov 12 2016 | Waiver of right of respondent Salix Capital US, Inc. to respond filed. |
Nov 14 2016 | Waiver of right of respondent The City of Philadelphia, PA Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority to respond filed. |
Nov 29 2016 | Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner. |
Dec 2 2016 | Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondent. |
Dec 9 2016 | Brief of respondent National Credit Union Administration Board as Liquidating Agent in opposition filed. |
Dec 9 2016 | Brief of respondents Ellen Gelboim, et al. in opposition filed. |
Dec 9 2016 | Brief amici curiae of Financial Industry Associations filed. |
Dec 9 2016 | Brief amici curiae of Antitrust Scholars filed. |
Dec 28 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 13, 2017. |
Dec 28 2016 | Reply of petitioners Bank of America Corporation, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Jan 17 2017 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Seth P. Waxman | Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP | (202) 663-6000 |
Counsel of Record | 1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | |
Washington, DC 20006 | ||
seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com | ||
Party name: Bank of America Corporation, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Daniel L. Brocket | Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP | (212) 849-7000 |
Counsel of Record | 51 Madison Avenue, 22nd Floor | |
New York, NY 10010 | ||
danielbrockett@quinnemanuel.com | ||
Party name: The City of Philadelphia, et al. | ||
Ian Heath Gershengorn | Acting Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice | |
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: National Credit Union Administration Board as Liquidating Agent | ||
Thomas C. Goldstein | Goldstein & Russell, P.C. | (202) 362-0636 |
Counsel of Record | 7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850 | |
Bethesda, MD 20814 | ||
tg@goldsteinrussell.com | ||
Party name: Ellen Gelboim, et al. | ||
Nanci Eiko Nishimura | Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP | (650) 697-6000 |
Counsel of Record | 840 Malcolm Road | |
Burlingame, CA 94010 | ||
ww.cpmlegal.com | ||
Party name: The Regents of the University of California, et al. | ||
Other: | ||
Charles Kevin. Marshall | Jones Day | (202) 879-3939 |
51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20001 | ||
ckmarshall@jonesday.com | ||
Party name: Antitrust Scholars | ||
Jon R. Roelike | Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP | (202) 739-5754 |
1111 Pennsylvania Ave., NW | ||
Washington, DC 20004 | ||
jonroelike@morganlewis.com | ||
Party name: Financial Industry Associations |