No. 16-284 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | September 2, 2016 | |||
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeals of New York |
Case Nos.: | (9) |
Decision Date: | June 2, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 30 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 3, 2016) |
Sep 29 2016 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 2, 2016. |
Nov 2 2016 | Brief of respondent The People of the State of New York by Eric T. Schneiderman, Attorney General of the State of New York in opposition filed. |
Nov 16 2016 | Reply of petitioners Maurice R. Greenberg, et al. filed. |
Nov 21 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 9, 2016. |
Dec 12 2016 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
David Boies | Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP | (914) 749-8200 |
333 Main Street | ||
Armonk, NY 10504 | ||
dboies@bsfllp.com | ||
Party name: Maurice R. Greenberg, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Barbara D. Underwood | Solicitor General | (212) 416-8020 |
Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General | |
120 Broadway | ||
New York, NY 10271-0332 | ||
Barbara.Underwood@ag.ny.gov | ||
Party name: The People of the State of New York by Eric T. Schneiderman, Attorney General of the State of New York |