No. 16-1068 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | March 6, 2017 | |||
Linked with 16A626 | ||||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (16-3603, 16-3691) |
Decision Date: | September 13, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 6, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 23 2016 | Application (16A626) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 4, 2017 to March 3, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Dec 27 2016 | Application (16A626) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 3, 2017. |
Mar 3 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 5, 2017) |
Mar 27 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 5, 2017. |
Apr 5 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Brennan Center for Justice filed. |
May 5 2017 | Brief of respondents Jon Husted, Ohio Secretary of State, et al. in opposition filed. |
May 22 2017 | Reply of petitioners Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless, et al. filed. |
May 23 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 8, 2017. |
Jun 12 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 15, 2017. |
Jun 19 2017 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Subodh Chandra | 1265 W. Sixth St., Suite 400 | (216) 578-1700 |
Counsel of Record | Cleveland, OH 44113 | |
Subodh.Chandra@chandralaw.com | ||
Party name: Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Eric E. Murphy | State Solicitor | (614) 466-8980 |
Counsel of Record | Office of the Ohio Attorney's General | |
30 East Broad Street, 17th Fl. | ||
Columbus, OH 43215-3428 | ||
eric.murphy@ohioattorneygeneral.gov | ||
Party name: Jon Husted, Ohio Secretary of State, et al. | ||
Other: | ||
P. Benjamin Duke | Covington & Burling LLP | (212) 841-1000 |
The New York Times Building | ||
620 Eighth Avenue | ||
New York, NY 10018 | ||
pbduke@cov.com | ||
Party name: Brennan Center for Justice |