No. 24A884 | |
Title: | Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al., Applicants v. CASA, Inc., et al. |
Docketed: | March 13, 2025 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (25-1153) |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Mar 13 2025 | Application (24A884) for a partial stay, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Mar 14 2025 | Response to application (24A884) requested by The Chief Justice, due by 4 p.m. (EDT), on April 4, 2025. |
Mar 14 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Mar 14 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Former National Security Official Joshua Steinman filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Mar 17 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of David Boyle supporting neither party filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 19 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Mar 21 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Tennessee filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Mar 24 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Former United States Attorney General Edwin Meese III filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Mar 25 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of William T. Dickson filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Mar 28 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Iowa, et al. filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Mar 28 2025 | Brief amici curiae of America's Future, et al. filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 02 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Student Political Research Initiative for New Governance, et al. filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 04 2025 | Response to application from respondents CASA, Inc., et al. filed. |
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 07 2025 | Reply of applicants Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. filed. |
ReplyProof of Service | |
Apr 07 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Professor Mila Sohoni filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 17 2025 | Application (24A884) referred to the Court. |
Apr 17 2025 | Consideration of the application (24A884) for partial stay presented to The Chief Justice and by him referred to the Court is deferred pending oral argument. Consideration of the application (24A885) for partial stay presented to Justice Kagan and by her referred to the Court is deferred pending oral argument. Consideration of the application (24A886) for partial stay presented to Justice Jackson and by her referred to the Court is deferred pending oral argument. The applications are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. The applications are set for oral argument at 10 a.m. on Thursday, May 15, 2025. |
Apr 17 2025 | SET FOR ARGUMENT at 10 a.m. on Thursday, May 15, 2025. VIDED. |
Apr 17 2025 | Amicus brief of Corey J. Biazzo, Esq. submitted. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 22 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Constitutional Law and Immigration filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 22 2025 | Any brief of an amicus curiae must be filed on or before Tuesday, April 29, 2025. |
Apr 22 2025 | Any motion pertaining to the oral argument in 24A884, 24A885 and 24A886 shall be filed on or before Tuesday, April 29, 2025. |
Apr 23 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America supporting neither party filed. (as to 24A884) |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 25 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Alan B. Morrison filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 28 2025 | Motion for divided argument filed by respondents in 24A884, 24A885 and 24A886. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 29 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Professor Gabriel J. Chin, et al. filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 29 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of West Virginia filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 29 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Common Cause filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 29 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Professor James E. Pfander supporting neither party filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 29 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Restaurant Law Center, et al. filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 29 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of B.A.M.N. (The Coalition to Defend Affirmative Action, Integration and Immigrant Rights and Fight for Equality By Any Means Necessary) filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 29 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Legal Historians filed. (as to 24A884) |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 29 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Members of the United States Congress filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 29 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Professor Suzette Malveaux, et al. filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 29 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of National Immigrant Justice Center filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 29 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Local Governments and Local Government Officials filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 29 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of G. Antaeus B. Edelsohn filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 29 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 30 2025 | Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit. |
Apr 30 2025 | Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit. The record is electronic and is available on PACER. |
May 05 2025 | Motion for divided argument filed by respondents GRANTED. VIDED. |
May 15 2025 | Argued. For applicants: D. John Sauer, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For state and city respondents: Jeremy M. Feigenbaum, Solicitor General, Trenton, N. J. For private respondents: Kelsi B. Corkran, Washington, D. C. VIDED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
D. John Sauer Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, D 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Kelsi Brown Corkran Counsel of Record | Institute for Constitutional Advocacy & Protection 600 New Jersey Ave NW Washington, DC 20001 KBC74@GEORGETOWN.EDU | 202-661-6728 |
Party name: CASA, Inc., et al. | ||
William Harold Powell | ICAP 600 New Jersey Avenue NW Washington, DC 20001 whp25@georgetown.edu | 814-282-4789 |
Party name: CASA, Inc., et al. | ||
Other | ||
John Christian Adams Counsel of Record | Public Interest Legal Foundation 107 S. West Street Suite 700 Alexandria, VA 22314 adams@publicinterestlegal.org | 703-745-5870 |
Party name: Former United States Attorney General Edwin Meese III | ||
Corey John Biazzo Counsel of Record | Biazzo Law PLLC P.O. Box 78373 6416 Rea Road, Suite B7 Charlotte, NC 28277 corey@biazzolaw.com | 7032975777 |
Party name: Corey J. Biazzo, Esq. | ||
David Christopher Boyle Counsel of Record | PO Box 15143 Long Beach, CA 90815 dbo@boyleslaw.org | (734)-904-6132 |
Party name: David Boyle | ||
Virginia Grace Davis Counsel of Record | Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP 560 Mission Street 27th Floor San Francisco, CA 94105 grace.davisfisher@mto.com | 415-512-4000 |
Party name: Legal Historians | ||
William T. Dickson Counsel of Record | 1101 Meredith Lane Suite 1411 Plano, TX 74093 wtdicksonattorney@gmail.com | 2146001425 |
Party name: William T. Dickson | ||
Gregory L. Diskant Counsel of Record | Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler, LLP 1133 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10036 gldiskant@pbwt.com | (212) 336-2000 |
Party name: Common Cause | ||
Shanta Driver Counsel of Record | UEAALDF 19767 Cranbrook Drive #111 Detroit, MI 48221 SHANTA.DRIVER@UEAA.NET | 3136830942 |
Party name: B.A.M.N. (The Coalition to Defend Affirmative Action, Integration and Immigrant Rights and Fight for Equality By Any Means Necessary) | ||
John C. Eastman Counsel of Record | Constitutional Counsel Group 444 W Ocean Blvd, Ste 1403 Long Beach, CA 90802 jeastman@ccg1776.com | 909-257-3869 |
Party name: The Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence | ||
Joan Deborah Bolinsky Edelsohn Counsel of Record | 460 Center Street Unit 6045 Moraga, CA 94570-6045 SAGEPropertiesLLC09@gmail.com | (415) 944-9509 |
Party name: G. Antaeus B. Edelsohn | ||
Gabriel Kalman Gillett Counsel of Record | Jenner & Block LLP 353 N. Clark Street Chicago, IL 60654 GGillett@jenner.com | 312-840-7220 |
Party name: Restaurant Law Center, et al. | ||
Brianne Jenna Gorod Counsel of Record | Constitutional Accountability Center 1200 18th Street, NW Suite 501 Washington, DC 20036 BRIANNE@THEUSCONSTITUTION.ORG | 202 296 6889 |
Party name: Scholars of Constitutional Law and Immigration | ||
Jeffrey T. Green Counsel of Record | Green Lauerman Chartered P.L.L.C. 1050 30th Street NW Washington, DC 20007 jeff@glclaw.net | 240-286-5686 |
Party name: Professor James E. Pfander | ||
Christopher J. Hajec Counsel of Record | Immigration Reform Law Institute 25 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 335 Washington, DC 20001 CHAJEC@IRLI.ORG | 202-232-5590 |
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute | ||
Whitney Downs Hermandorfer Counsel of Record | Office of Tennessee Attorney General & Reporter P.O. Box 20207 Nashville, TN 37202-0207 whitney.hermandorfer@ag.tn.gov | 615-741-7403 |
Party name: State of Tennessee | ||
Elbert Lin Counsel of Record | Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP 951 E. Byrd Street Riverfront Plaza, East Tower Richmond, VA 23219-4074 ELIN@HUNTONAK.COM | 804-788-7202 |
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America | ||
Suzette Marie Malveaux Counsel of Record | Washington and Lee University School of Law 506 Sydney Lewis Hall Lexington, VA 24450 smalveaux@wlu.edu | (540) 458-8524 |
Party name: Civil Procedure Professors Suzette Malveaux, Alan Trammell, Alexi Pfeffer-Gillett, and Doug Rendleman | ||
R. Trent McCotter Counsel of Record | Boyden Gray PLLC 800 Connecticut Ave. NW Suite 900 Washington, DC 20006 tmccotter@boydengray.com | 202-706-5488 |
Party name: Members of Congress | ||
Jonathan B. Miller Counsel of Record | Public Rights Project 490 43rd Street, #115 Oakland, CA 94609 JON@PUBLICRIGHTSPROJECT.ORG | (510) 738-6788 |
Party name: Local Governments and Local Government Officials | ||
Alan B. Morrison Counsel of Record | George Washington Law School 2000 H Street NW Washington, DC 20052 ABMORRISON@LAW.GWU.EDU | 2029947120 |
Party name: Alan B. Morrison | ||
William Jeffrey Olson Counsel of Record | William J. Olson, P.C. 370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4 Vienna, VA 22180 WJO@MINDSPRING.COM | 7033565070 |
Party name: America's Future, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of California, Citizens United, Leadership Institute, U.S. Constitutional Rights Legal Defense Fund, The Claremont Institute Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund | ||
Charles G. Roth Counsel of Record | National Immigrant Justice Center 111 West Jackson Blvd., Suite 800 Chicago, IL 60604 croth@immigrantjustice.org | 3126601613 |
Party name: National Immigrant Justice Center | ||
Kevin K. Russell Counsel of Record | Russell & Woofter LLC 1701 Pennsylvania Ave., NW Suite 200 Washington, DC 20006 krussell@russellwoofter.com | 2022408433 |
Party name: Professor Mila Sohoni | ||
Judd Edward Stone II Counsel of Record | Stone | Hilton PLLC 600 Congress Ave. Suite 2350 Austin, TX 78701 judd@stonehilton.com | (737) 465-7248 |
Party name: Former National Security Official Joshua Steinman | ||
Jonathan T. Weinberg Counsel of Record | Wayne State University School of Law 471 West Palmer Avenue Detroit, MI 48202-0000 weinberg@wayne.edu | 3135773933 |
Party name: Members of the U.S. Congress | ||
Eric Harris Wessan Counsel of Record | lowa Attomey General' s Office 1305 E Walnut St. Second Floor Des Moines, IA 50319 eric.wessan@ag.iowa.gov | 2032475091 |
Party name: Iowa and 19 Other States | ||
Michael Ray Williams Counsel of Record | Office of the West Virginia Attorney General State Capitol Complex, Bldg. 1, Rm E-26 1900 Kanawha Blvd. E Charleston, WV 25305 michael.r.williams@wvago.gov | 304-558-2021 |
Party name: State of West Virginia | ||
Zachary Jay Wolfe Counsel of Record | 2100 Foxhall Rd NW Ames 218 Washington, DC 20007 zwolfe@gwu.edu | 202-242-5130 |
Party name: Student Political Research Initiative for New Governance & Youth Scholars | ||
Darryl M. Woo Counsel of Record | Goodwin Procter LLP 525 Market Street Floor 32 San Francisco, CA 94105 dwoo@goodwinlaw.com | (415) 733-6000 |
Party name: Professors Gabriel J. Chin, Erika Lee, and Paul Finkelman |