No. 24A1063 | |
Title: | Social Security Administration, et al., Applicants v. American Federation of State, County, and Municipal Employees, et al. |
Docketed: | May 2, 2025 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (25-1411) |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 02 2025 | Application (24A1063) for a stay, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 02 2025 | Response to application (24A1063) requested by The Chief Justice, due by 4 p.m. (EDT) on May 12, 2025. |
May 12 2025 | Response to application from respondents American Federation of State, County, and Municipal Employees, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 13 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Veterans and Labor Unions filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 13 2025 | Reply of applicants Social Security Administration, et al. filed. |
ReplyProof of Service |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
D. John Sauer Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, D 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Social Security Administration, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Mark Benjamin Samburg | Democracy Forward Foundation PO Box 34553 Washington, DC 20043 msamburg@democracyforward.org | 202-448-9090 |
Party name: American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO, et al. | ||
Alethea Anne Swift Counsel of Record | Democracy Forward P.O. Box 34553 Washington, DC 20043 aswift@democracyforward.org | 202-448-9090 |
Party name: American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, AFL-CIO, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Xiaonan April Hu Counsel of Record | Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP 601 Massachusetts Ave. NW. Suite 500E Washington, DC 20001-5369 april.hu@mto.com | 202-220-1100 |
Party name: Veterans and Labor Unions |