No. 24A1059 | |
Title: | Kristi Noem, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, et al., Applicants v. National TPS Alliance, et al. |
Docketed: | May 1, 2025 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (25-2120) |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 01 2025 | Application (24A1059) for a stay, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 01 2025 | Response to application (24A1059) requested by Justice Kagan, due by 5 p.m. (EDT) on May 8, 2025. |
May 07 2025 | Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 08 2025 | Response to application from respondent National TPS Alliance, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of ServiceProof of Service | |
May 08 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 08 2025 | Brief amici curiae of America's Future, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 08 2025 | Brief amici curiae of Immigration Law Scholars filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 09 2025 | Reply of applicant Kristi Noem, Secretary of Homeland Security, et al. filed. |
ReplyProof of Service | |
May 16 2025 | Letter to Clerk of America's Future, Citizens United, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund submitted. |
Main Document | |
May 19 2025 | Application (24A1059) referred to the Court. |
May 19 2025 | Application (24A1059) for stay presented to Justice Kagan and by her referred to the Court is granted. The March 31, 2025 order entered by the United States District Court for the Northern District of California, case No. 3:25-cv-1766, is stayed pending the disposition of the appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, if such a writ is timely sought. Should certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. This order is without prejudice to any challenge to Secretary Noem's February 3, 2025 vacatur notice insofar as it purports to invalidate EADs, Forms I-797, Notices of Action, and Forms I-94 issued with October 2, 2026 expiration dates. See 8 U. S. C. ยง1254a(d)(3). Justice Jackson would deny the application. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
D. John Sauer Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, D 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Kristi Noem, Secretary of Homeland Security, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Ahilan T. Arulanantham Counsel of Record | UCLA SCHOOL OF LAW 385 Charles Young Drive East Los Angeles, CA 90095 ARULANANTHAM@LAW.UCLA.EDU | (310) 825-1029 |
Party name: National TPS Alliance, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Robert Seungchul Chang Counsel of Record | Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality UC Irvine School of Law 401 E. Peltason Drive Irvine, CA 92697 rchang@law.uci.edu | 2063905676 |
Party name: Members of Congress | ||
Christopher J. Hajec Counsel of Record | Immigration Reform Law Institute 25 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 335 Washington, DC 20001 CHAJEC@IRLI.ORG | 202-232-5590 |
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute | ||
Anne Lai Counsel of Record | UC Irvine School of Law 501 E. Peltason Dr. Irvine, CA 92697-8000 alai@law.uci.edu | (949) 824-9894 |
Party name: Immigration Law Scholars | ||
Jeremiah Lee Morgan Counsel of Record | William J. Olson, P.C. 370 Maple Avenue West Suite 4 Vienna, VA 22180-5615 wjo@mindspring.com | 7033565070 |
Party name: America's Future, Citizens United, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund |