No. 24A973
Title:Nicole Gilbert-Daniels, Applicant
v.
Lions Gate Entertainment, Inc., et al.
Docketed:April 11, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(24-153)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 09 2025Application (24A973) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 22, 2025 to June 21, 2025, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main Document
Apr 11 2025Application (24A973) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 21, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nicole Gilbert-Daniels
    Counsel of Record
5829 Campbellton Road
Suite 104-273
Atlanta, GA 30331

Party name: Nicole Gilbert-Daniels