No. 24A947
Title:Alice Guan, Applicant
v.
Ellingsworth Residential Community Association, Inc.
Docketed:April 4, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-12969, 21-12971, 21-13231)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 02 2025Application (24A947) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 13, 2025 to June 12, 2025, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Apr 04 2025Application (24A947) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until May 13, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alice Guan
    Counsel of Record
198 Tremont Street
Unit 316
Boston, MA 02116

Party name: Alice Guan