No. 24A923
Title:Cecil Jerome Quinn, Jr., Applicant
v.
J. Mark Hayes, II, Judge, Circuit Court of South Carolina, et al.
Docketed:March 26, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(24-6248)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 26 2025Application (24A923) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 26, 2025 to July 25, 2025, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Apr 01 2025Application (24A923) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 25, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Cecil Jerome Quinn Jr.#311338
Broad River Institution
4460 Broad River Road
Columbia, SC 29210

Party name: Cecil Jerome Quinn