No. 24A902
Title:Michael Prete, Applicant
v.
Rhode Island
Docketed:March 20, 2025
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Rhode Island
   Case Numbers:(SU-2024-0235-CA)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 18 2025Application (24A902) for a stay, submitted to Justice Jackson.
Main Document
Mar 21 2025Application (24A902) denied by Justice Jackson.
Mar 21 2025Application (24A902) refiled and submitted to Justice Alito.
Apr 16 2025DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/2/2025.
Apr 16 2025Application (24A902) referred to the Court.
May 05 2025Application (24A902) denied by the Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Prete
    Counsel of Record
782 Boston Neck Road
Narragansett, RI 02882

Party name: Michael Prete