No. 24A9
Title:Nathan Cooper, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:July 8, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-10224)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 01 2024Application (24A9) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 23, 2024 to August 22, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 08 2024Application (24A9) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 22, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Lee Adler
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
One East Broward Blvd.
Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

ANDREW_ADLER@FD.ORG
954-356-7436
Party name: Nathan Cooper
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States