No. 24A896
Title:Maria Elena Swett Urquieta, Applicant
v.
John Francis Bowe
Docketed:March 17, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(24-1407)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 13 2025Application (24A896) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 23, 2025 to May 22, 2025, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Mar 18 2025Application (24A896) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until May 22, 2025.
May 12 2025Application of María Elena Swett Urquieta for a further extension of time not accepted for filing. (May 14, 2025)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Richard Min
    Counsel of Record
Green Kaminer Min & Rockmore LLP
420 Lexington Avenue
Suite 2821
New York, NY 10170

rmin@gkmrlaw.com
2122571944
Party name: María Elena Swett Urquieta