No. 24A876
Title:Salvador Bravo, Applicant
v.
Raul Torrez, Attorney General of New Mexico, et al.
Docketed:March 12, 2025
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(24-2034)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 05 2025Application (24A876) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 18, 2025 to May 2, 2025, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Mar 12 2025Application (24A876) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until May 2, 2025.
Apr 23 2025Application (24A876) to extend further the time from May 2, 2025 to May 17, 2025, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Written RequestProof of Service
May 09 2025Application (24A876) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until May 16, 2025.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Salvador Bravo82842
SNMCF-POU
P.O. Box 639
Las Cruces, NM 88004

Party name: Salvador Bravo