No. 24A7
Title:Duke Bradford, et al., Applicants
v.
Department of Labor, et al.
Docketed:July 8, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1023)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 02 2024Application (24A7) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 29, 2024 to September 12, 2024, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jul 12 2024Application (24A7) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until August 28, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Steven M. Simpson
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
3100 Clarendon Boulevard
Suite 1000
Arlington, VA 22201

ssimpson@pacificlegal.org
(916)288-1398
Party name: Duke Bradford, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: U.S. Department of Labor, et al.