No. 24A6
Title:Advance Colorado, et al., Applicants
v.
Jena Griswold, Colorado Secretary of State
Docketed:July 8, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-1282)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 01 2024Application (24A6) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 25, 2024 to September 23, 2024, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jul 12 2024Application (24A6) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until August 24, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
William E. Trachman
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 South Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

wtrachman@mslegal.org
3032922021
Party name: Advance Colorado, et al.