No. 24A573
Title:Kenneth Carey, et al., Applicants
v.
Jonathan Kirk, et al.
Docketed:December 12, 2024
Linked with 24-7128
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-10308)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 09 2024Application (24A573) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 8, 2024 to February 6, 2025, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Dec 12 2024Application (24A573) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 7, 2025.
Apr 29 2025Petition for Writ of Certiorari of Kenneth Carey, et al. not accepted for filing. (May 02, 2025)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jonathan May, Esq.
    Counsel of Record
The Lions' Den, Attorneys at Law
1395 Brickell Avenue
Suite 900
Miami, FL 33131

jm@tldaal.com
(305) 699-5466
Party name: Kenneth Carey, et al.
Jonathan Eric MayThe Lions' Den, Attorney at Law
1395 Brickell Avenue, 8th Floor
Miami, FL 33131

jm@tldaal.com
7869730686
Party name: Kenneth Carey, et al.