No. 24A5
Title:First Finance International Bank, Inc., Applicant
v.
Office of the Commissioner of Financial Institutions
Docketed:July 3, 2024
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Puerto Rico
   Case Numbers:(CC-2024-0022)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 01 2024Application (24A5) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 4, 2024 to September 2, 2024, submitted to Justice Jackson.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jul 08 2024Application (24A5) granted by Justice Jackson extending the time to file until September 2, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kevin Richard Myer
    Counsel of Record
KRMLegal LLC
1155 S. Power Rd. Ste 114
PMB 1047
MESA, AZ 85206

kevin@krm-legal.com
6027435332
Party name: First Finance International Bank, Inc. (FFBI)